This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2022 at 16:43:13 (UTC).

MARIA E MARRUJO RENTERIA VS CITY OF COMPTON, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 MARIA E MARRUJO RENTERIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF COMPTON, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4067

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARRUJO RENTERIA MARIA E

Defendants

CITY OF COMPTON A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN

Defendant Attorney

ROBERTS JR. REGINALD

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/3/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/1/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

12/15/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

1/21/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

2/18/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2024
  • Hearing11/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • Hearing05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • Hearing05/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension; Filed by City of Compton, a Public Entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maria E Marrujo Renteria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria E Marrujo Renteria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maria E Marrujo Renteria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria E Marrujo Renteria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF COMPTON is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN