This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/16/2022 at 13:37:08 (UTC).

MARIA DELOURDES CRUZ VS USA CINEMA INVESTMENTS HOLDING, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 MARIA DELOURDES CRUZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against USA CINEMA INVESTMENTS HOLDING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AUDRA MORI and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2322

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AUDRA MORI

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRUZ MARIA DELOURDES

Defendant

USA CINEMA INVESTMENTS HOLDING INC. DBA CINEPOLIS USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERTS CHRISTOPHER KENT

Defendant Attorney

SANTA-ROMANA MARK VILAR

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

10/28/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/14/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Settlement

3/4/2022: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 03/16/2022

3/16/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 03/16/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

3/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Request for Dismissal

3/23/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Firm Name

11/16/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISCTRICT)]

6/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISCTRICT)]

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISCTRICT)

6/25/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISCTRICT)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/30/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

3/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/30/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/7/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

1/27/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Maria Delourdes Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Docketat 10:44 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Settlement) of 03/16/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Maria Delourdes Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by USA Cinema Investments Holding, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by USA Cinema Investments Holding, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maria Delourdes Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by USA Cinema Investments Holding, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by USA Cinema Investments Holding, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Maria Delourdes Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maria Delourdes Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria Delourdes Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Delourdes Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USA CINEMA INVESTMENTS HOLDING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERTS CHRISTOPHER KENT