This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 02:07:00 (UTC).

MARIA DELGADO VS ALBERTO PAREDES ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2017 MARIA DELGADO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALBERTO PAREDES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7405

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

DELGADO MARIA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

PAREDES ALBERTO

SEDEGHI DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

SARAJIAN ALEX ESQ.

PADUA KARINA A.

Defendant Attorneys

ELAINE W. YAN DEPUTY ATTORNEY

ROBINSON DAVID E. ESQ.

BAIRAMIAN LARA DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEY

MIYAMOTO RONALD KEN

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/24/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC AND RELATED DISCOVERY DATES PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY CENTRAL DISTRICT

6/1/2018: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC AND RELATED DISCOVERY DATES PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY CENTRAL DISTRICT

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

6/19/2018: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/19/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

6/19/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

SUMMONS

6/19/2018: SUMMONS

CROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES)

6/19/2018: CROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES)

Unknown

7/16/2018: Unknown

ANSWER OF THE CROSS DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO CROSS COMPLAINANT ALBERTO PAREDES CROSS COMPLAINT

8/24/2018: ANSWER OF THE CROSS DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO CROSS COMPLAINANT ALBERTO PAREDES CROSS COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT ALBERTO PAREDES EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DECLARATIONS OF DAVID E. ROBINSON;AND ETC.

8/31/2018: DEFENDANT ALBERTO PAREDES EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DECLARATIONS OF DAVID E. ROBINSON;AND ETC.

PROPOSED ORDER

8/31/2018: PROPOSED ORDER

Minute Order

8/31/2018: Minute Order

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

9/21/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/27/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service

10/15/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

10/19/2018: Request for Dismissal

Answer

10/25/2018: Answer

Request for Dismissal

2/15/2019: Request for Dismissal

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by David Sedeghi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial FSC and Related deadlines) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial FSC and Rel...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Continue Trial FSC and Related Deadlines); Filed by David Sedeghi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Maria Delgado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Alberto Paredes (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Maria Delgado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Maria Delgado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Maria Delgado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. PREMISES LIABILITY 2.NEGLIGENCE - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Delgado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7405    Hearing Date: July 29, 2020    Dept: 29

Delgado v. Paredes et al.

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff is GRANTED. Counsel has complied with California Rules of Court 3.1362. The order is effective upon the filing of the proof of service of the motion on the Plaintiff. Until then, counsel remains counsel of record.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PADUA KARINA A.