*******0671
01/12/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Other Contract
Los Angeles, California
DEL SOCORRO ANGUIANO MARIA
ECHEVERRIA ANTHONY CRISTIAN
GENERAL MOTORS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
YANG MICHELLE
1/12/2023: Complaint
1/12/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet
1/12/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
1/12/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
1/12/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
1/12/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
1/12/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
1/18/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference
1/23/2023: Proof of Personal Service
Hearing06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: MARIA DEL SOCORRO ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 01/19/2023; Service Cost: 73.94; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MARIA DEL SOCORRO ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); ANTHONY CRISTIAN ECHEVERRIA (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARIA DEL SOCORRO ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); ANTHONY CRISTIAN ECHEVERRIA (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: MARIA DEL SOCORRO ANGUIANO (Plaintiff); ANTHONY CRISTIAN ECHEVERRIA (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Mel Red Recana in Department 45 Stanley Mosk Courthouse
[-] Read Less