This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 11:26:47 (UTC).

MARIA DEL CARMEN ROCHA MENDOZA VS JOSEPH CARL NOBILE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 MARIA DEL CARMEN ROCHA MENDOZA filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JOSEPH CARL NOBILE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8100

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROCHA MENDOZA MARIA DEL CARMEN

Cross Defendants and Defendants

NISSAN MOTOR CORP. IN USA

NOBILE JOSEPH CARL

NISSAN OF DOWNTOWN LA

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

NOBILE JOSEPH CARL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HOSTETLER HARRY FRANKLIN

GIBBS PATRICK

Other Attorneys

LIOSI-TRAUT PAMELA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

6/9/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

6/10/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

6/22/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Cross-Complaint

5/19/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

5/19/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

5/19/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service

3/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/10/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

3/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/19/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

3/22/2021: PI General Order

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2024
  • Hearing02/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • Hearing08/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • Hearing08/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Nissan North America, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Joseph Carl Nobile (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Nissan North America, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Maria Del Carmen Rocha Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Joseph Carl Nobile (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Joseph Carl Nobile (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Joseph Carl Nobile (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maria Del Carmen Rocha Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maria Del Carmen Rocha Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Maria Del Carmen Rocha Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Maria Del Carmen Rocha Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maria Del Carmen Rocha Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria Del Carmen Rocha Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maria Del Carmen Rocha Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria Del Carmen Rocha Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Del Carmen Rocha Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NISSAN OF DOWNTOWN LA is a litigant

Latest cases where NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nissan North America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIOSI-TRAUT PAMELA S