Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2019 at 21:06:15 (UTC).

MARIA CURSAGE VS STEVE LARKIN

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 MARIA CURSAGE filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against STEVE LARKIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN, SAMANTHA JESSNER and RAMONA G. SEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5087

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

SAMANTHA JESSNER

RAMONA G. SEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CURSAGE MARIA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

LARKIN STEVE DBA SRL CONSTRUCTION

Cross Defendant

THROUGH 100 MOES 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROVENS DOUGLAS J.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KENNEDY KEVIN P.

DECAMP CAMILLE JOY

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

10/29/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Cross-Complaint

9/17/2019: Cross-Complaint

Answer - STEVE LARKIN DBA SRL CONSTRUCTION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/17/2019: Answer - STEVE LARKIN DBA SRL CONSTRUCTION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Objection - DEFENDANT, STEVE LARKIN DBA SRL CONSTRUCTION'S JELD-WEN V. SUPERIOR COURT OBJECTION

9/17/2019: Objection - DEFENDANT, STEVE LARKIN DBA SRL CONSTRUCTION'S JELD-WEN V. SUPERIOR COURT OBJECTION

Case Management Statement

8/22/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/19/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (1. STEVE LARKIN DBA SRL CONSTRUCTIONS DEMURRER TO FIRST AMEN...)

7/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (1. STEVE LARKIN DBA SRL CONSTRUCTIONS DEMURRER TO FIRST AMEN...)

Reply - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STEVE LARKEN DBA SRL CONSTRUCTION'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF MARIA CURSAGE

7/15/2019: Reply - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STEVE LARKEN DBA SRL CONSTRUCTION'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF MARIA CURSAGE

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA TO NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF, MARIA CURSAGE, TRUSTEE OF THE MARIA CURSAGE TRUST'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT STEVE LAR

7/19/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA TO NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF, MARIA CURSAGE, TRUSTEE OF THE MARIA CURSAGE TRUST'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT STEVE LAR

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

7/10/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT STEVE LARKIN DBA SRL CONSTRUCTION TO THE FOURTH CAUSE OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/31/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT STEVE LARKIN DBA SRL CONSTRUCTION TO THE FOURTH CAUSE OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

5/31/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT STEVE LARKIN DBA SRL CONSTRUCTION TO FOURTH CAUSE OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFF MARIA CURSAGE, TRUSTEE OF THE MARIA CURSAGE TRUST'S F

5/31/2019: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT STEVE LARKIN DBA SRL CONSTRUCTION TO FOURTH CAUSE OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFF MARIA CURSAGE, TRUSTEE OF THE MARIA CURSAGE TRUST'S F

Proof of Service by Mail

5/31/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

5/31/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/29/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

3/18/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court)

2/28/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • Hearing02/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Hearing01/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Complex Designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Docketat 3:38 PM in Department M, Ramona G. See, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 11/22/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketStipulation for Entry of Case Management Order No. 1; Filed by Maria Cursage (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Ramona G. See, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Steve Larkin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Ramona G. See, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Ramona G. See, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maria Cursage (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 1, Samantha Jessner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court) of 02/28/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court's Ruling Re Non-Complex Determination;) of 02/25/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court's Ruling Re Non-Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria Cursage (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Cursage (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNEDY KEVIN P.