This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2021 at 07:59:27 (UTC).

MARIA CRISTINA LOPEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CARLOS EDMUNDO LOPEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 MARIA CRISTINA LOPEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CARLOS EDMUNDO LOPEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9611

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ AN INDIVIDUAL MARIA CRISTINA

Defendants

CARLOS LOPEZ DEMOLITION AND HAULING A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

LOPEZ HAULING A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

FRANCO AN INDIVIDUAL JERRY CEASAR

LOPEZ AN INDIVIDUAL CARLOS EDMUNDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANGOLI SHAWN L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/8/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/25/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2024
  • Hearing05/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • Hearing11/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • Hearing11/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARIA CRISTINA LOPEZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARIA CRISTINA LOPEZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARIA CRISTINA LOPEZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANGOLI SHAHRAM