This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2021 at 21:44:15 (UTC).

MARIA CHUNG VS MATAN MOTI LERNER

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 MARIA CHUNG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MATAN MOTI LERNER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1459

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHUNG MARIA

Defendant

LERNER MATAN MOTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAHINYAN GARRI

Defendant Attorney

OGUNNUBI MELISSA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/9/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

6/9/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/22/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/30/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

7/26/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/26/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2024
  • Hearing06/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • Hearing12/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Hearing11/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Matan Moti Lerner (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Matan Moti Lerner (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Maria Chung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maria Chung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria Chung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Maria Chung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Chung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OGUNNUBI MELISSA