This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2023 at 03:52:06 (UTC).

MARIA CHAVEZ VS CITY OF MONTEBELLO, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 MARIA CHAVEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CITY OF MONTEBELLO, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNE RICHARDSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7075

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANNE RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAVEZ MARIA

Defendants

BOBADILLA RENE

CITY OF MONTEBELLO A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL ENTITY

RAZO NICHOLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHONEY PAUL

Defendant Attorney

DOUMANIAN NANCY PRAPION

 

Court Documents

Answer

4/10/2023: Answer

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

4/10/2023: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/10/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/10/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Ruling

3/8/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - (AMENDED)

2/28/2023: Minute Order - (AMENDED)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

2/28/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NANCY DOUMANIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

2/21/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NANCY DOUMANIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS (1) CITY OF MONTEBELLO, (2) NICHOLAS RAZO AND (3) RENE BOBADILLA; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

2/21/2023: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS (1) CITY OF MONTEBELLO, (2) NICHOLAS RAZO AND (3) RENE BOBADILLA; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE RE ALL DEFENDANTS

2/14/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE RE ALL DEFENDANTS

Objection - OBJECTION TO JUDICIAL NOTICE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS

2/14/2023: Objection - OBJECTION TO JUDICIAL NOTICE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

2/14/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/2/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/3/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NANCY DOUMANIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF MONTEBELLO (1) DEMURRER TO AND (2) MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

12/29/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NANCY DOUMANIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF MONTEBELLO (1) DEMURRER TO AND (2) MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

12/29/2022: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

12/29/2022: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NANCY DOUMANIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS NICHOLAS RAZO AND RENE BOBADILLAS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

12/29/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NANCY DOUMANIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS NICHOLAS RAZO AND RENE BOBADILLAS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2023
  • Hearing07/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 07/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CITY OF MONTEBELLO, a California municipal entity (Defendant); As to: MARIA CHAVEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: NICHOLAS RAZO (Defendant); RENE BOBADILLA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MARIA CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF MONTEBELLO, a California municipal entity (Defendant); NICHOLAS RAZO (Defendant); RENE BOBADILLA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: MARIA CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF MONTEBELLO, a California municipal entity (Defendant); NICHOLAS RAZO (Defendant); RENE BOBADILLA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: MARIA CHAVEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10): Filed By: CITY OF MONTEBELLO, a California municipal entity (Defendant); Result: Overruled ; Result Date: 02/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10): Filed By: RENE BOBADILLA (Defendant),NICHOLAS RAZO (Defendant); Result: Sustained ; Result Date: 02/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Attorney; As to: CITY OF MONTEBELLO, a California municipal entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: MARIA CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: RENE BOBADILLA (Defendant); Service Date: 11/30/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: MARIA CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF MONTEBELLO, a California municipal entity (Defendant); Service Date: 11/30/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MARIA CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF MONTEBELLO, a California municipal entity (Defendant); NICHOLAS RAZO (Defendant); RENE BOBADILLA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARIA CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF MONTEBELLO, a California municipal entity (Defendant); NICHOLAS RAZO (Defendant); RENE BOBADILLA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MARIA CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF MONTEBELLO, a California municipal entity (Defendant); NICHOLAS RAZO (Defendant); RENE BOBADILLA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David Sotelo in Department 40 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less