This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/22/2022 at 19:39:37 (UTC).

MARIA CHAVEZ VS CITY OF MONTEBELLO, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 MARIA CHAVEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CITY OF MONTEBELLO, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7075

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAVEZ MARIA

Defendants

BOBADILLA RENE

CITY OF MONTEBELLO A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL ENTITY

RAZO NICHOLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHONEY PAUL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/23/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/23/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/23/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

12/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: MARIA CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: NICHOLAS RAZO (Defendant); Service Date: 11/30/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: MARIA CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: RENE BOBADILLA (Defendant); Service Date: 11/30/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: MARIA CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF MONTEBELLO, a California municipal entity (Defendant); Service Date: 11/30/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MARIA CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF MONTEBELLO, a California municipal entity (Defendant); NICHOLAS RAZO (Defendant); RENE BOBADILLA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARIA CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF MONTEBELLO, a California municipal entity (Defendant); NICHOLAS RAZO (Defendant); RENE BOBADILLA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MARIA CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF MONTEBELLO, a California municipal entity (Defendant); NICHOLAS RAZO (Defendant); RENE BOBADILLA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David Sotelo in Department 40 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF MONTEBELLO A GOVERNMENT ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAHONEY PAUL