This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2023 at 06:33:22 (UTC).

MARIA CHAVEZ RODRIGUEZ VS TARGET CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/21/2022 MARIA CHAVEZ RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TARGET CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0734

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAVEZ RODRIGUEZ MARIA

Defendant

TARGET CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEREZ ANTHONY

Defendant Attorney

BUBION JUSTIN ARNOLD

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

6/7/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL DISMISSAL/STATUS ON REMOVAL...)

6/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL DISMISSAL/STATUS ON REMOVAL...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER OF REMAND BY FEDERAL COURT

4/24/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER OF REMAND BY FEDERAL COURT

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION RE MAXIMUM DAMAGES

3/29/2023: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION RE MAXIMUM DAMAGES

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 02/21/2023

2/21/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 02/21/2023

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/21/2023

2/21/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/21/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

2/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

2/17/2023: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Answer

2/14/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

2/3/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NABIL FREIJ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSELS REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE

1/4/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NABIL FREIJ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSELS REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE

Complaint

10/21/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/21/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/21/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/21/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • Hearing08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order [PROPOSED] STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER; Signed and Filed by: Target Corporation (Defendant); As to: Maria Chavez Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Target Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order [PROPOSED] STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER: Filed By: Target Corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 06/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Dismissal/Status On Removal...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Dismissal/Status On Removal to Federal Court scheduled for 06/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D updated: Result Date to 06/06/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketAddress for Anthony Perez (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice of Entry of Order Of Remand By Federal Court; Filed by: Target Corporation (Defendant); As to: Maria Chavez Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketStipulation - No Order Stipulation Re Maximum Damages; Filed by: Target Corporation (Defendant); As to: Maria Chavez Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Nabil Freij in Support of Plaintiffs Counsels Request for Continuance; Filed by: Maria Chavez Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Maria Chavez Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Target Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Maria Chavez Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Target Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maria Chavez Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Target Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ralph C. Hofer in Department D Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less