This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/17/2021 at 00:07:55 (UTC).

MARIA ARANA OLIVAREZ VS LA AMAPOLA, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 MARIA ARANA OLIVAREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LA AMAPOLA, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9104

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLIVAREZ MARIA ARANA

Defendant

LA AMAPOLA INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN R.

Defendant Attorney

MOSIER MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/1/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/19/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

12/19/2019: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/22/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI GENERAL ORDER AND HEARING DATES

11/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI GENERAL ORDER AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/27/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/31/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/31/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/31/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/31/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Maria Arana Olivarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LA AMAPOLA, INC, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by LA AMAPOLA, INC, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI General Order and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Maria Arana Olivarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maria Arana Olivarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Arana Olivarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria Arana Olivarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA AMAPOLA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOSIER MATTHEW