This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2022 at 17:00:36 (UTC).

MARIA AMADOR VS COLONIAL CARE CENTER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 MARIA AMADOR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against COLONIAL CARE CENTER, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1067

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMADOR MARIA

Defendants

COLONIAL CARE CENTER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LONGWOOD MANAGEMENT CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CROSNER MICHAEL R

Defendant Attorney

ABBOTT LESLIE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/28/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/28/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/28/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/28/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/12/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

7/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...)

7/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...) OF 07/06/2022

7/6/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...) OF 07/06/2022

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

7/5/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Proof of Personal Service

8/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Related Case

8/12/2022: Notice of Related Case

Answer

8/26/2022: Answer

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2022
  • Hearing10/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • Hearing09/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by COLONIAL CARE CENTER, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); LONGWOOD MANAGEMENT CORP., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by COLONIAL CARE CENTER, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); LONGWOOD MANAGEMENT CORP., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MARIA AMADOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MARIA AMADOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Information); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • Docketat 4:01 PM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...) of 07/06/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by MARIA AMADOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARIA AMADOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARIA AMADOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARIA AMADOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONGWOOD MANAGEMENT CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where COLONIAL CARE CENTER INC. DBA COLONIAL CARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABBOTT LESLIE