This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2023 at 15:02:17 (UTC).

MARIA ALICIA GONZALEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CITY OF INGLEWOOD, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 MARIA ALICIA GONZALEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF INGLEWOOD, A PUBLIC ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0028

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ AN INDIVIDUAL MARIA ALICIA

Defendants

BLUE AND GOLD TENANT LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF INGLEWOOD A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

PERFORMANCE COMPANY LLC UNKNOWN ENTITY

PINCAY RE LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

HOLLYWOOD PARK MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC

STADCO LA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VARTANYAN NICOLE J.

Defendant Attorneys

PELCH MANAL H.

MALLORY GEORGE LORENZO

BRADLEY ERIC C.

 

Court Documents

Answer

8/10/2023: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/22/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/22/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE, FSC, AND ALL OTHER PRETRIAL FILINGS ANDOR MOTION DEADLINES

6/21/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE, FSC, AND ALL OTHER PRETRIAL FILINGS ANDOR MOTION DEADLINES

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

5/12/2023: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED

5/8/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/2/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Dismissal

4/27/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/27/2023: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO DISMISS THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

4/27/2023: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO DISMISS THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Demand for Jury Trial

3/24/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

3/24/2023: Answer

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

3/24/2023: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Answer

3/6/2023: Answer

Answer

2/23/2023: Answer

Answer

2/22/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

1/26/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/26/2023: Proof of Personal Service

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2025
  • Hearing03/19/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2024
  • Hearing06/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2024
  • Hearing06/03/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: PINCAY RE, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); PERFORMANCE COMPANY LA, LLC Erroneously Sued As PERFORMANCE COMPANY LLC, UNKNOWN ENTITY (Defendant); HOLLYWOOD PARK MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Defendant); Stadco LA, LLC (Defendant); As to: MARIA ALICIA GONZALEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: MARIA ALICIA GONZALEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: Stadco LA, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: MARIA ALICIA GONZALEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: HOLLYWOOD PARK MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation and [proposed] Order to Continue Trial Date, Fsc, and All Other Pretrial Filings andor Motion Deadlines; Signed and Filed by: PINCAY RE, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); PERFORMANCE COMPANY LA, LLC Erroneously Sued As PERFORMANCE COMPANY LLC, UNKNOWN ENTITY (Defendant); As to: MARIA ALICIA GONZALEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [proposed] Order to Continue Trial Date, Fsc, and All Other Pretrial Filings andor Motion Deadlines: Filed By: PINCAY RE, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant),PERFORMANCE COMPANY LA, LLC Erroneously Sued As PERFORMANCE COMPANY LLC, UNKNOWN ENTITY (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 06/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 09/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 06/03/2024 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 06/17/2024 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 03/19/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MARIA ALICIA GONZALEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF INGLEWOOD, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARIA ALICIA GONZALEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF INGLEWOOD, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MARIA ALICIA GONZALEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF INGLEWOOD, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less