This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2022 at 09:28:46 (UTC).

MARIA ALCALA VS UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/07/2022 MARIA ALCALA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0094

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALCALA MARIA

Defendant

UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALINDO ALEXIS

Defendant Attorney

MARCHLEWSKI THERESA M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/8/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/8/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/7/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/5/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

5/2/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • Hearing08/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDefendant UKA's Big Saver Foods, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff Maria Alcala's Complaint For Damages; Filed by UKA'S Big Saver Foods, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Maria Alcala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria Alcala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Alcala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maria Alcala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARCHLEWSKI THERESA M.