This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 01:29:43 (UTC).

MARIA ALAMILLA-GALAN VS TIM KUOK LEI ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/21/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by MARIA ALAMILLA-GALAN against TIM KUOK LEI in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8941

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ALAMILLA-GALAN MARIA

Defendants and Respondents

LEI WUN FONG

DOES 1 THROUGH 30 INCLUSIVE

LEI TIM KUOK

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ROBIN IVORY

9/13/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ROBIN IVORY

Opposition

10/31/2018: Opposition

Reply

11/5/2018: Reply

Minute Order

11/15/2018: Minute Order

Order

11/15/2018: Order

Notice of Ruling

11/16/2018: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/25/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

CoverSheet

3/21/2018: CoverSheet

Summons

3/21/2018: Summons

Complaint

3/21/2018: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Tim Kuok Lei (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Tim Kuok Lei (Defendant); Wun Fong Lei (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike ((Legacy)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Minute Order ((Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Order (Ruling re: Defendant's motion to strike portions of plaintiff's complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Reply (To Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendant' Motion To Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by Tim Kuok Lei (Defendant); Wun Fong Lei (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Strike Portions Of Plaintiff's Complaint; Filed by Maria Alamilla-Galan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by Tim Kuok Lei (Defendant); Wun Fong Lei (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ROBIN IVORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Maria Alamilla-Galan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Maria Alamilla-Galan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Maria Alamilla-Galan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC698941    Hearing Date: December 06, 2019    Dept: 2

BC698941 Alamilla-Galan v. Lei, et al.

On the court’s own motion, the hearing on the Motions for Order Compelling Plaintiff’s Responses to Discovery set for 12/6/19 is continued to 12/11/19 at 1:30 p.m. in Department SS-2. The due dates for the opposition and reply are based on the original hearing date.