This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2017 at 09:43:54 (UTC).

MARI ANA ESPINOZA VS FLYING FOOD GROUP PACIFIC INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 MARI ANA ESPINOZA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FLYING FOOD GROUP PACIFIC INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5719

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ESPINOZA MARI ANA

Respondents and Defendants

FLYING FOOD GROUP PACIFIC INC

BARBA JUAN

DOES 1 TO 25

FLYING FOOD GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

AMES SCOTT R. ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

CONKLE JOHN A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/20/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

6/20/2017: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

SUMMONS

6/20/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. UNLAWFUL SEXUAL / GENDER HARASSMENT; ETC

6/20/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. UNLAWFUL SEXUAL / GENDER HARASSMENT; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/10/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANTS FLING FOOD GROUP PACIFIC, INC. AND FLYING FOOD GROUP, LLC

7/21/2017: NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANTS FLING FOOD GROUP PACIFIC, INC. AND FLYING FOOD GROUP, LLC

Minute Order

7/27/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ORDER RE: RELATED CASE AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/3/2017: NOTICE OF ORDER RE: RELATED CASE AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

8/10/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/11/2017: Unknown

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/15/2017: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING INITIAL JURY FEES

8/16/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING INITIAL JURY FEES

Minute Order

8/16/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

8/16/2017: Unknown

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2017
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (W/PREJ., ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Notice (OF ORD RE RELATED CASE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Notice (OF FILING ORIG P.O.S. ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Notice-Related Cases (BC649634 --(MOONEY) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLYING FOOD GROUP PACIFIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FLYING FOOD GROUP, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMES SCOTT ROBERT