This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2019 at 11:08:21 (UTC).

MARGUERITE STOECKEN VS BRIUS MANAGEMENT CO INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/17/2017 MARGUERITE STOECKEN filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against BRIUS MANAGEMENT CO INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4377

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STOECKEN MARGUERITE

Respondents and Defendants

ROCKPORT HEALTHCARE SERVICES

EUREKA-LET GP LLC

BRIUS LLC

BOARDWALK WEST FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES LLC

BRIUS MANAGEMENT CO. INC.

EUREKA-LET LP

LAWNDALE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE

VERNON HEALTHCARE CENTER LLC

WISH-I-AH SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS

FORTUNA REHABILITATION & WELLNESS CENTER

RECHNITZ SHLOMO

FORTUNA WELLNESS GP LLC

PACIFIC REHABILITATION & WELLNESS CENTER

RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE

MAYWOOD SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS

PACIFIC WELLNESS GP LLC

INDIO HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER LLC

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARNS ROBERT S. ESQ.

GARCIA STEPHEN M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Order

12/12/2017: Order

CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (C.C.P. 382] 1. VIOLATION OF THE CONSUMER LEGAL REMEDIES ACT (CIVIL CODE 1750, ET SEQ.) ;ETC

3/17/2017: CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (C.C.P. 382] 1. VIOLATION OF THE CONSUMER LEGAL REMEDIES ACT (CIVIL CODE 1750, ET SEQ.) ;ETC

SUMMONS

3/17/2017: SUMMONS

Minute Order

4/10/2017: Minute Order

Order

4/10/2017: Order

Notice

4/21/2017: Notice

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/18/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/19/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/19/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/19/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/19/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/19/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/19/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/19/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/19/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/19/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/19/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/19/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/02/2018

DocketCase File - Public

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2017

DocketOrder; Filed by Marguerite Stoecken (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2017

DocketOrder -ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS BRIUS MANAGEMENT CO., INC., ET AL., WITHOUT PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2017

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 307; Initial Status Conference (Initial Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2017

DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Marguerite Stoecken (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2017

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2017

DocketRequest -PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ORDER DISMISSING CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2017

Docket-PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2017

DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2017

DocketDeclaration -DECLARATION OF ROBERT S. ARNS IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDER DISMISSING CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
104 More Docket Entries
05/18/2017

DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2017

DocketDisassociation of Attorney; Filed by Marguerite Stoecken (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2017

DocketNotice NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2017

Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 307; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2017

DocketOrder; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2017

DocketOrder INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX CASES AND CLASS ACTIONS)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2017

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2017

DocketComplaint; Filed by Marguerite Stoecken (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2017

DocketCLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (C.C.P. 382] 1. VIOLATION OF THE CONSUMER LEGAL REMEDIES ACT (CIVIL CODE 1750, ET SEQ.) ;ETC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2017

DocketSUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less