Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 01:17:00 (UTC).

MARGINE LEFFRIDGE VS 20 CAP FUND I, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY REGISTERED AS A CALIFORNIA FOREIGN ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 MARGINE LEFFRIDGE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 20 CAP FUND I, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY REGISTERED AS A CALIFORNIA FOREIGN ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7343

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEFFRIDGE MARGINE

Defendants

FUSCO JAY

20 CAP FUND I LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY REGISTERED AS A CALIFORNIA FOREIGN ENTITY

FUSCO CARL J.

NPA ASSOCIATES LLC AN UNREGISTERED CONNECTICUT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS

BELL LARS

FLAGSTAR BANK FSB A FEDERALLY CHARTERED SAVINGS BANK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/25/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/25/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • Hearing06/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Margine Leffridge (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Margine Leffridge (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 20 CAP FUND I, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS is a litigant

Latest cases where Flagstar Bank Fsb is a litigant