This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/12/2019 at 16:04:25 (UTC).

MARGAUX HUTCHINSON, AN INDIVIDUAL VS HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 MARGAUX HUTCHINSON, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6305

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

HUTCHINSON AN INDIVIDUAL MARGAUX

Defendant and Respondent

HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIHU KAVEH S

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS COLE DONALD

 

Court Documents

Judgment - JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS, INC

7/23/2019: Judgment - JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS, INC

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT OR ORDER

8/20/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT OR ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING CONTINUANCE

10/15/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING CONTINUANCE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF COLED. LEWIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT

10/15/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF COLED. LEWIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT

Objection - OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF SAMUEL MOORHEAD IN SUPPORT OF MARGAUX HUTCHINSON'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

10/15/2019: Objection - OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF SAMUEL MOORHEAD IN SUPPORT OF MARGAUX HUTCHINSON'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/15/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT

10/15/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT

Reply - REPLY ISO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT

10/21/2019: Reply - REPLY ISO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE

10/22/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION AN ORDER ADVANCING THE DATE F...)

10/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION AN ORDER ADVANCING THE DATE F...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE DATE FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF SAMUEL MOORHEAD; EXHIBITS

10/23/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE DATE FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF SAMUEL MOORHEAD; EXHIBITS

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

10/24/2019: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal - APPEAL - NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL, FILED 10/24/19

10/29/2019: Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal - APPEAL - NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL, FILED 10/24/19

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

11/7/2019: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Order - ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS, INC. TO PLAINTIFF MARGAUX HUTCHINSON'S COMPLAINT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

6/24/2019: Order - ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS, INC. TO PLAINTIFF MARGAUX HUTCHINSON'S COMPLAINT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SAMUEL J. MOORHEAD, ESQ. FOR THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR ON 07/02/2019

7/18/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SAMUEL J. MOORHEAD, ESQ. FOR THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR ON 07/02/2019

Declaration - DECLARATION OF COLE D. LEWIS REGARDING OSC RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT JULY 2, 2019 HEARING

7/19/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF COLE D. LEWIS REGARDING OSC RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT JULY 2, 2019 HEARING

Notice of Ruling

7/19/2019: Notice of Ruling

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by Margaux Hutchinson, an individual (Appellant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (for Notice of Appeal, filed 10/24/19); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed; Filed by Margaux Hutchinson, an individual (Appellant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (An Order Advancing The Date For Hearing On Motion To Set Aside Judgment) - Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (An Order Advancing The Date For Hearing On Motion To Set Aside Judgment); Filed by Margaux Hutchinson, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application An Order Advancing The Date F...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketOpposition (Opposition to Plaintiff?s Ex Parte Application for an Order Advancing Hearing Date); Filed by Houlihan Lokey Financial Advisors, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketReply (ISO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT); Filed by Margaux Hutchinson, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Houlihan Lokey Financial Advisors, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (ISO Demurrer); Filed by Houlihan Lokey Financial Advisors, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Houlihan Lokey Financial Advisors, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER); Filed by Margaux Hutchinson, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Margaux Hutchinson, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Margaux Hutchinson, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Margaux Hutchinson, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Margaux Hutchinson, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less