This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/27/2020 at 18:09:33 (UTC).

MARGARITO RIOS SR VS FACEY MEDICAL GROUP ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 MARGARITO RIOS SR filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against FACEY MEDICAL GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI and HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0076

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RIOS MARGARITO SR.

Defendants and Respondents

FACEY MEDICAL GROUP

DOES 1 TO 100

FIELDS SCOTT A. MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CASTRANOVA ELIA JAMES ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LAW YUK K. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/24/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

10/24/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

11/22/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

12/20/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

12/20/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

1/22/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/29/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

DEFENDANTS SCOTT A. FIELDS, M.D. AND FACEY MEDICAL GROUP'S NOTICE OF LODGING RECORDS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

5/30/2018: DEFENDANTS SCOTT A. FIELDS, M.D. AND FACEY MEDICAL GROUP'S NOTICE OF LODGING RECORDS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SCOTT A. FIELDS, M.D. AND FACEY MEDICAL GROUP?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ELLA JAMES CASTRANOVA; DECLARATIO

7/27/2018: PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SCOTT A. FIELDS, M.D. AND FACEY MEDICAL GROUP?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ELLA JAMES CASTRANOVA; DECLARATIO

DEFENDANTS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION TO THE DECLARTION OF ROBERT E. COLE, M.D.

8/10/2018: DEFENDANTS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION TO THE DECLARTION OF ROBERT E. COLE, M.D.

REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED AND DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

8/10/2018: REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED AND DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

DEFENDANTS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION TO THE DECLARTION OF MARGARITO RIOS, SR.

8/10/2018: DEFENDANTS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION TO THE DECLARTION OF MARGARITO RIOS, SR.

PLAIITIFFS RESPONSE TO THE REPLY OF DEFENDANT FACEY MEDICAL GROUP EN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND ETC.

8/15/2018: PLAIITIFFS RESPONSE TO THE REPLY OF DEFENDANT FACEY MEDICAL GROUP EN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND ETC.

ORDER GRANTING DR. FIELDS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING FACEY MEDICAL GROUP'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/17/2018: ORDER GRANTING DR. FIELDS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING FACEY MEDICAL GROUP'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order -

8/17/2018: Minute Order -

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

5/21/2019: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE

11/21/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

10/18/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • Hearing06/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Hearing06/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by MARGARITO SR. RIOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Elia James Castranova, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by MARGARITO SR. RIOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Elia James Castranova, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANTS FACEY MEDICAL GROUP AND SCOTT A. FIELDS, M.D.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FACEY MEDICAL GROUP (Defendant); SCOTT A. MD FIELDS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by FACEY MEDICAL GROUP (Defendant); SCOTT A. MD FIELDS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by FACEY MEDICAL GROUP (Defendant); SCOTT A. MD FIELDS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARGARITO SR. RIOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC680076    Hearing Date: January 22, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MARGARITO RIOS, SR.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

FACEY MEDICAL GROUP, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC680076

[TENATATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

January 22, 2020

Plaintiff’s attorney of record, Elia James Castranova, seeks to be relieved as counsel, contending the attorney-client relationship has broken down such that further representation is not possible. Counsel declares he served the moving papers on his client via mail at a confirmed address. Counsel has filed proof of service on his client and on all other parties who have appeared in the action.

The motion is unopposed and granted; the ruling is effective upon filing proof of service of the final order. The Court notes that trial is not scheduled until 6/30/20 and therefore there will be no prejudice to Plaintiff as a result of the granting of this motion.

Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.

Case Number: BC680076    Hearing Date: December 17, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MARGARITO RIOS, SR.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

FACEY MEDICAL GROUP, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC680076

[TENATATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 18, 2019

Counsel declares, at ¶3a(1) of his declaration, that he personally served the moving papers on Plaintiff.  However, the proof of service shows service of the moving papers by mail.  The motion is therefore denied without prejudice.  Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.  

Case Number: BC680076    Hearing Date: November 21, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MARGARITO RIOS, SR.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

FACEY MEDICAL GROUP, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC680076

[TENATATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 21, 2019

Plaintiff’s attorney seeks to be relieved as counsel, contending there has been a breakdown of the relationship that renders further representation impossible. Counsel failed to file proof of service of a proposed order. CRC 3.1362(d), (e). The motion is therefore denied without prejudice. Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.