This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2020 at 00:55:23 (UTC).

MARGARITA HAMMOND REYES VS IMAX CORPORATION, A CANADIAN CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 MARGARITA HAMMOND REYES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against IMAX CORPORATION, A CANADIAN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3141

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REYES MARGARITA HAMMOND

Defendant

IMAX CORPORATION DBA IMAX WORLDWIDE HOMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NALBANDYAN A. JACOB

CHAN KELLY

Defendant Attorney

LEE JOSEPH K.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

8/25/2020: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

8/26/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/7/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Dismissal

10/9/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/21/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/21/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

12/4/2019: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/6/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/5/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/21/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/21/2019: Case Management Statement

Amended Complaint

10/10/2019: Amended Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/10/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/4/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/2/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Margarita Hammond Reyes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Margarita Hammond Reyes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default/Answer) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Margarita Hammond Reyes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by IMAX CORPORATION dba IMAX Worldwide Home Erroneously Sued As IMAX Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Kelly Chan); Filed by Margarita Hammond Reyes, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Margarita Hammond Reyes, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Margarita Hammond Reyes, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Margarita Hammond Reyes, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Margarita Hammond Reyes, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Margarita Hammond Reyes, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMAX LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAN KA IN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NALBANDYAN A. JACOB