This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2021 at 03:10:07 (UTC).

MARGARITA BELTRAN, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 MARGARITA BELTRAN, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0591

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELTRAN AN INDIVIDUAL MARGARITA

Defendants

CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL A PUBLIC ENTITY

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF LONG BEACH A PUBLIC ENTITY

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

DOE AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN

KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE #II A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROFAEL JOHN R.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/15/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/2/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2024
  • Hearing05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Hearing11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • Hearing11/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARGARITA BELTRAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARGARITA BELTRAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARGARITA BELTRAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL is a litigant

Latest cases where KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE #H is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LONG BEACH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROFAEL JOHN R.