This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/11/2021 at 13:58:33 (UTC).

MARGARET VANDER WAAL VS SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC., A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 MARGARET VANDER WAAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC , A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0192

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VANDER WAAL MARGARET

Defendant

SUBARU OF AMERICA INC. A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

RUGGERELLO KRISTAN

Other Attorneys

ROMANO MARK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/16/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

4/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT ADDENDUM

4/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT ADDENDUM

Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

4/19/2021: Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

Answer

5/13/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION]

7/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION]

Order - ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION

7/19/2021: Order - ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/1/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal

10/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Margaret Vander Waal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order Trial Preparation]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketOrder (Trial Preparation); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Margaret Vander Waal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Margaret Vander Waal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Joint Case Management Conference Statement Addendum); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Margaret Vander Waal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Margaret Vander Waal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Margaret Vander Waal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Margaret Vander Waal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROMANO MARK