This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 08:47:40 (UTC).

MARGARET MILES VS CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH

Case Summary

On 11/28/2017 MARGARET MILES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL E. WHITAKER and FREDERICK C. SHALLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5093

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILES MARGARET

Defendant

MANHATTAN BEACH CITY OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALEZ BRIAN CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorneys

QUILLER DOMINIC A

MCCUNE DANA JOHN

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRIAN GONZALEZ IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTSEX PARTE TO CONTINUE TRIAL

7/10/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRIAN GONZALEZ IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTSEX PARTE TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

7/11/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

7/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Notice of Ruling

7/22/2019: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PHYSICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF

10/10/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PHYSICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF

Separate Statement

10/10/2019: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

10/15/2019: Separate Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH TO...)

10/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH TO...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL IME

10/16/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL IME

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH TO...) OF 10/16/2019

10/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH TO...) OF 10/16/2019

Notice - NOTICE THAT NOVEMBER 4 HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MARGARET MILES TO SUBMIT TO A PHYSICAL EXAMINATION BY WILLIAM STETSON, M.D. IS OFF CALENDAR

10/31/2019: Notice - NOTICE THAT NOVEMBER 4 HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MARGARET MILES TO SUBMIT TO A PHYSICAL EXAMINATION BY WILLIAM STETSON, M.D. IS OFF CALENDAR

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 11/04/2019

11/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 11/04/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

11/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 BY CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH RE BARRIERS

2/13/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 BY CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH RE BARRIERS

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 BY CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH RE BOLLARD

2/13/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 BY CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH RE BOLLARD

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 BY CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH RE WORK ORDER

2/13/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 BY CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH RE WORK ORDER

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE 3

2/24/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE 3

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE 2

2/24/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE 2

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • Hearing01/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by MARGARET MILES (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by MANHATTAN BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Docketat 3:13 PM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: final status conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
112 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MANHATTAN BEACH, CITY OF (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by MARGARET MILES (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by MARGARET MILES (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES (PREMISES LIABILITY/NEGLIGENCE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARGARET MILES (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5093    Hearing Date: November 04, 2019    Dept: 5

Margaret Miles v. City of Manhattan Beach

Case No. BC65093

Trial Setting Conference

The Court's tentative is to set the dates as follows:

Final Status Conference:  February 7, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial:  February 21, 2020, at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motions cut-off shall be based on the new trial date.  Any party who does not appear at the trial setting conference shall waive their right to be heard and shall submit to this tentative order.  In the event that one party appears and requests different dates, if the other party does not appear, that party shall waive their right to be heard and shall submit to any new dates. 



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANHATTAN BEACH CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUILLER DOMINIC A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCUNE DANA JOHN ESQ