This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2021 at 22:25:33 (UTC).

MARGARET MADONNA VS ROGER RETHMEIER

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 MARGARET MADONNA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROGER RETHMEIER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1586

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MADONNA MARGARET

Defendants

RETHMEIER ROGER

ROSSI JOHN MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BURNS HUGH R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/14/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

2/16/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Declaration of Mailing

5/27/2021: Declaration of Mailing

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

5/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

Declaration re: Due Diligence

5/25/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/25/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Dismissal

7/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/28/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Margaret Madonna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Margaret Madonna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Mailing; Filed by Margaret Madonna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Margaret Madonna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Margaret Madonna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Margaret Madonna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Margaret Madonna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Margaret Madonna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Margaret Madonna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURNS HUGH R. ESQ.