This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 01:07:17 (UTC).

MARGARET KEEGAN VS JEFFREY ALLEN LEVE

Case Summary

On 04/16/2018 MARGARET KEEGAN filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JEFFREY ALLEN LEVE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2058

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEEGAN MARGARET

Defendant

LEVE JEFFREY ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SABOL CRISTOPHER G.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/16/2018: Complaint

Summons

4/16/2018: Summons

Other -

4/16/2018: Other -

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/11/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/11/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

5/3/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Service

7/3/2018: Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE

6/28/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order

6/18/2018: Minute Order

Order

10/25/2018: Order

Request for Dismissal

10/25/2018: Request for Dismissal

Declaration

10/18/2018: Declaration

Minute Order

9/26/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/14/2018: Minute Order

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; (Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Margaret Keegan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketOrder (re: dismissal); Filed by Margaret Keegan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (of Christopher G. Sabol, ESQ., in Response to the 27 August 2018 Order to Show Cause); Filed by Margaret Keegan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72; (Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-26 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-08-14 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 12; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-05-03 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Margaret Keegan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SABOL CRISTOPHER G.