Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 23:07:26 (UTC).

MARGARET JAIME, ET AL. VS ELIZABETH RIVERA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 MARGARET JAIME filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ELIZABETH RIVERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are VIRGINIA KEENY and VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0965

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

VIRGINIA KEENY

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARZA REUBEN R.

ORTIZ ESTHER

JAIME MARGARET

Defendants

ORTIZ EDWARD

RIVERA ELIZABETH

VAUGHN MARY FORMERLY MARY ESTRADA

GARZA JOHN PATRICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEFF MICHAEL D.

Defendant Attorney

BURNS NIGEL

 

Court Documents

Trial Brief

2/11/2021: Trial Brief

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

3/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/11/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Lis Pendens

2/17/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

2/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/11/2021

1/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/11/2021

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/12/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

11/20/2020: Answer

Answer

11/20/2020: Answer

Answer

11/20/2020: Answer

Answer

11/20/2020: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/15/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/29/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/1/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/31/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • Hearing08/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department C, Valerie Salkin, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department C, Valerie Salkin, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Margaret Jaime (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department C, Valerie Salkin, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Margaret Jaime (Plaintiff); Esther Ortiz (Plaintiff); Reuben R. Garza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Edward Ortiz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Mary formerly Mary Estrada Vaughn (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by John Patrick Garza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Elizabeth Rivera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Margaret Jaime (Plaintiff); Esther Ortiz (Plaintiff); Reuben R. Garza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Margaret Jaime (Plaintiff); Esther Ortiz (Plaintiff); Reuben R. Garza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Margaret Jaime (Plaintiff); Esther Ortiz (Plaintiff); Reuben R. Garza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less