This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/03/2023 at 22:15:23 (UTC).

MARGARET DAVIS-ESSEX, ET AL. VS KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 MARGARET DAVIS-ESSEX, filed an Other lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1662

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESSEX DONALD

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMER JUSTIN A

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/25/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/25/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/25/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/25/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/25/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/25/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/31/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

2/14/2023: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MARGARET

2/14/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MARGARET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2023
  • Hearing05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing: Status Date changed from 02/07/2023 to 02/14/2023 ; As To Parties: ; Status changed from Rejected to Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Margaret; Filed by: Donald Essex (Plaintiff); As to: Margaret Davis-Essex (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch in Department 39 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Margaret Davis-Essex (Plaintiff); Donald Essex (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant); Southern California Permanente Medical Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Margaret Davis-Essex (Plaintiff); Donald Essex (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant); Southern California Permanente Medical Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less