This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2021 at 02:49:09 (UTC).

MARCUS DANIELS VS RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 MARCUS DANIELS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2988

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIELS MARCUS

Defendants

LAST NAME UNKNOWN RAFAEL

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MESSRELIAN HAROUT A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/8/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/7/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • Hearing12/14/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Hearing11/16/2021 at 09:15 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Marcus Daniels (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marcus Daniels (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marcus Daniels (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MESSRELIAN HAROUT A