This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2021 at 07:22:32 (UTC).

MARCOS SAUER VS JOHN MICHAEL BALLOR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 MARCOS SAUER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHN MICHAEL BALLOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7483

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAUER MARCOS

Defendants

LYNNBALLOR THEODORA

BALLOR JOHN MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENEDETTO SERGIO

Defendant Attorney

GOWER RICHARD S.

 

Court Documents

Answer

7/6/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

3/15/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/25/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2024
  • Hearing02/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • Hearing08/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • Hearing08/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JOHN MICHAEL BALLOR (Defendant); THEODORA LYNNBALLOR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MARCOS SAUER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MARCOS SAUER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARCOS SAUER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARCOS SAUER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARCOS SAUER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOWER RICHARD S.