This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2022 at 05:44:50 (UTC).

MARCOS QUIROZ VS AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 MARCOS QUIROZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9938

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUIROZ MARCOS

Defendant

AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN RAY

Defendant Attorney

FRANZ STEPHEN C

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

2/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 02/18/2022

2/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 02/18/2022

Request for Dismissal

2/28/2022: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING APPROVAL OF PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL ACT SETTLEMENT (LABOR CODE 2698 ET SEQ.); [PROPOSED] ORDER

12/20/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING APPROVAL OF PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL ACT SETTLEMENT (LABOR CODE 2698 ET SEQ.); [PROPOSED] ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Order - ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

8/23/2021: Order - ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

8/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER RE TRIAL DATES)

8/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER RE TRIAL DATES)

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED ORDER] GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE APRIL 29, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/12/2021: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED ORDER] GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE APRIL 29, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

4/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/12/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE APRIL 29, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/12/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE APRIL 29, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

7/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Answer

1/15/2021: Answer

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/20/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Status Conference (reSettlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MARCOS QUIROZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 39; Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Docketat 4:26 PM in Department 39; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 02/18/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING APPROVAL OF PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL ACT SETTLEMENT (LABOR CODE 2698 ET SEQ.); [PROPOSED] ORDER); Filed by MARCOS QUIROZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docketat 10:40 AM in Department 39; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MARCOS QUIROZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by MARCOS QUIROZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARCOS QUIROZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARCOS QUIROZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARCOS QUIROZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less