This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2022 at 19:40:21 (UTC).

MARCOS OJENDIZ VS JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 MARCOS OJENDIZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN and CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5253

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OJENDIZ MARCOS

Defendant

JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GENISH JONATHAN M.

Defendant Attorney

ROBINSON MARK B.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/24/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/12/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/12/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

1/10/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

1/7/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

1/7/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

3/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF MARCOS OJENDIZS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONALS NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; DECLARATION OF JOANA FANG IN SUPPORT THEREOF

2/22/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF MARCOS OJENDIZS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONALS NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; DECLARATION OF JOANA FANG IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Notice of Related Case

2/17/2022: Notice of Related Case

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • Hearing07/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • Hearing05/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketOpposition (PLAINTIFF MARCOS OJENDIZ?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL?S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; DECLARATION OF JOANA FANG IN SUPPORT THEREOF); Filed by Marcos Ojendiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Jonathan Louis International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Marcos Ojendiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jonathan Louis International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jonathan Louis International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Marcos Ojendiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Marcos Ojendiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Marcos Ojendiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marcos Ojendiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marcos Ojendiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Marcos Ojendiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GENISH JONATHAN MEIR