This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2022 at 15:09:15 (UTC).

MARCOLIN EYEWEAR VS AGA & TITAN, INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 MARCOLIN EYEWEAR filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AGA TITAN, INC , A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN J. KRALIK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0506

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN J. KRALIK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCOLIN EYEWEAR

Defendants

AMAYAKAN GAGIK

AGA & TITAN INC. A CORPORATION DBA ECLIPSE EYEWEAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDMAN MARTIN F

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - WRIT - RETURN (LOS ANGELES)

8/29/2022: Writ - Return - WRIT - RETURN (LOS ANGELES)

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

1/10/2022: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Judgment - JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) BY DEFAULT BY COURT

1/19/2021: Judgment - JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) BY DEFAULT BY COURT

Case Management Statement

1/6/2021: Case Management Statement

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

1/12/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/12/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

1/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

Summary of the Case - SUMMARY OF THE CASE AND STATEMENT OF FACTS INTEREST CALCULATIONS PURSUANT TO CRC SECTION 3.1800

1/12/2021: Summary of the Case - SUMMARY OF THE CASE AND STATEMENT OF FACTS INTEREST CALCULATIONS PURSUANT TO CRC SECTION 3.1800

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/4/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/5/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

10/5/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/5/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/18/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/18/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Filed By: MARCOLIN EYEWEAR (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 08/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketWrit - Return (Los Angeles) ( Partially Satisfied); MARCOLIN EYEWEAR (Plaintiff); Costs Credits: 92.00; Interest Credits: 993.43; Principal Credits: 3,835.29; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: MARCOLIN EYEWEAR (Plaintiff); As to: AGA & TITAN, INC., A CORPORATION (Defendant); GAGIK AMAYAKAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: MARCOLIN EYEWEAR (Plaintiff); As to: AGA & TITAN, INC., A CORPORATION (Defendant); GAGIK AMAYAKAN (Defendant); County: Los Angeles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): As To Parties changed from AGA & TITAN, INC., A CORPORATION (Defendant), GAGIK AMAYAKAN (Defendant) to AGA & TITAN, INC., A CORPORATION (Defendant), GAGIK AMAYAKAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: MARCOLIN EYEWEAR (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff MARCOLIN EYEWEAR against Defendant GAGIK AMAYAKAN and Defendant AGA & TITAN, INC., A CORPORATION DBA ECLIPSE EYEWEAR on the Complaint filed by MARCOLIN EYEWEAR on 08/18/2020 for damages of $85,154.64, attorney fees of $2,593.00, and costs of $674.22 for a total of $88,421.86.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketJudgment (PROPOSED) BY DEFAULT BY COURT; Filed by: MARCOLIN EYEWEAR (Plaintiff); As to: AGA & TITAN, INC., A CORPORATION (Defendant); GAGIK AMAYAKAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment (PROPOSED) BY DEFAULT BY COURT: Filed By: MARCOLIN EYEWEAR (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 01/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNotice Of Case Management Conference; Filed by: MARCOLIN EYEWEAR (Plaintiff); As to: AGA & TITAN, INC., A CORPORATION (Defendant); GAGIK AMAYAKAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MARCOLIN EYEWEAR (Plaintiff); As to: AGA & TITAN, INC., A CORPORATION (Defendant); GAGIK AMAYAKAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MARCOLIN EYEWEAR (Plaintiff); As to: AGA & TITAN, INC., A CORPORATION (Defendant); GAGIK AMAYAKAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARCOLIN EYEWEAR (Plaintiff); As to: AGA & TITAN, INC., A CORPORATION (Defendant); GAGIK AMAYAKAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. John J. Kralik in Department B Burbank Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AGA & TITAN INC. A CORPORATION DBA ECLIPSE EYEWEAR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDMAN MARTIN F