This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2020 at 11:53:59 (UTC).

MARCO BARRIOS ET AL VS MARINA PIANCA ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 MARCO BARRIOS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARINA PIANCA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9142

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BARRIOS MARCO

SANCHEZ HEIDI

Defendants and Respondents

FOX RENT A CAR INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

PIANCA MARINA

Not Classified By Court

ALEXANDRA ZEPEDA A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM HEIDI SANCHEZ

MELANIE SANCHEZ

ANA VELASQUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DAG LAW FIRM APC

FISHENFELD RACHEL ELLEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF JUNE 11, 2020 HEARING)

4/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF JUNE 11, 2020 HEARING)

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

12/17/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

12/17/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

12/17/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

12/17/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

12/17/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

12/17/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

12/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/2/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

11/18/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

11/18/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

11/18/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

11/18/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

11/18/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

11/18/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/18/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/18/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

11/18/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • Hearing11/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal for failure to serve / alternatively Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (dismissal for failure to serve / alternatively Trial Setting Conference) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • Docketat 10:12 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Continuance of June 11, 2020 Hearing)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Continuance of June 11, 2020 Hearing) of 04/21/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (--4840) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (--7851) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (--0554) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (--8803) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (--7092) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel (--2828); Filed by Rachel Ellen Fishenfeld (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel (--6774); Filed by Rachel Ellen Fishenfeld (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Marco Barrios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marco Barrios (Plaintiff); Heidi Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC709142    Hearing Date: January 24, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

marco barrios, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

marina pianca, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC709142

Hearing Date: January 24, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motionS to be relieved as counsel

Attorneys DAG Law Firm, APC (“Counsel”) move to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiffs Marco Barrios, Heidi Sanchez, Ana Velasquez, Melanie Sanchez, and Alexandra Zepeda (“Plaintiffs”). The motions are granted.

Counsel have filed forms MC-051 and MC-052 and have lodged with the Court copies of the proposed order on form MC-053 as required. (Cal Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.) The basis for these motions is a breakdown in the relationship between Counsel and Plaintiffs. This is a proper basis for withdrawal. Accordingly, the motions are granted.

Counsel should note that the order will become effective upon the filing of proofs of service of a signed copies of the orders on Plaintiffs. Counsel will remain the attorneys of record until Counsel files with the court proofs of service of the signed orders.

DATED: January 24, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC709142    Hearing Date: December 13, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

marco barrios, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

marina pianca, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC709142

Hearing Date: December 13, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motionS to be relieved as counsel

Attorneys DAG Law Firm, APC (“Counsel”) move to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiffs Marco Barrios, Heidi Sanchez, Ana Velasquez, Melanie Sanchez, and Alexandra Zepeda (“Plaintiffs”). Counsel gave notice to Plaintiffs on November 18, 2019 by overnight mail. That is not adequate notice. (See Code Civ. Proc., § 1005, subd. (b).) Accordingly, the Court denies the motions without prejudice. Counsel are ordered to provide notice of this order and file proof of service of such.

DATED: December 13, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court