This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2022 at 01:31:47 (UTC).

MARCO ANTONIO VERGARA VS PAUL ANTHONY BLACK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 MARCO ANTONIO VERGARA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PAUL ANTHONY BLACK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5311

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VERGARA MARCO ANTONIO

Defendants

BLACK PAUL ANTHONY

PROGISTICS DISTRIBUTION INC.

SUPPOSE U DRIVE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELORYAN HAIK

Defendant Attorneys

KIM BENJAMIN

SHIMKIN DAVID A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/9/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

7/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

7/13/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/20/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

11/10/2021: Answer

Answer

8/16/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2024
  • Hearing07/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Hearing01/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • Hearing12/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Suppose U Drive, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Paul Anthony Black (Defendant); Progistics Distribution, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marco Antonio Vergara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Marco Antonio Vergara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marco Antonio Vergara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marco Antonio Vergara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marco Antonio Vergara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Marco Antonio Vergara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marco Antonio Vergara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGISTICS DISTRIBUTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SUPPOSE U DRIVE INC. is a litigant