This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2022 at 14:27:41 (UTC).

MARCIO VARELA VS MV TRANSPORTATION, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 MARCIO VARELA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MV TRANSPORTATION, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2349

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VARELA MARCIO

Defendants

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

LACMTA

MV PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION INC.

MV TRANSPORTATION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OSTOIA ADINA A

Defendant Attorneys

MATHEVOSIAN RINA M

LIPMAN PAUL JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/25/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

6/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Answer

9/15/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

9/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

9/16/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITHOUT PREJUDICE) PARTIAL

9/20/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITHOUT PREJUDICE) PARTIAL

Request for Dismissal

10/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

10/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2024
  • Hearing06/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • Hearing12/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Hearing11/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Marcio Varela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Marcio Varela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal ((Without Prejudice) Partial); Filed by Marcio Varela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MV PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION, INC. Erroneously Sued As MV Transportation, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marcio Varela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marcio Varela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marcio Varela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marcio Varela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marcio Varela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marcio Varela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Marcio Varela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marcio Varela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LACMTA is a litigant

Latest cases where MV TRANSPORTATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MV PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OSTOIA ADINA A.