This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2022 at 09:25:27 (UTC).

MARCI BOSWELL VS ASO, L.L.C., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/05/2019 MARCI BOSWELL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ASO, L L C , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RUTH ANN KWAN, CURTIS A. KIN and JAMES R. DUNN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1374

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JAMES R. DUNN

RUTH ANN KWAN

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOSWELL MARCI

Defendants

ASO L.L.C. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TD FORECLOSURE SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WOLCOTT LYNN

ASO L.L.C.

TD FORECLOSURE SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRONNER DEBORAH R.

Defendant Attorneys

GREENBLATT FREDRIC J

GREENBLATT FREDRIC J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

10/12/2021: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

10/26/2021: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

10/29/2021: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

11/3/2021: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

11/4/2021: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

11/22/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

11/22/2021: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

9/23/2021: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

9/13/2021: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Affidavit of Identity and Order

5/11/2021: Affidavit of Identity and Order

Default Judgment

3/30/2021: Default Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT ASO AND DEF...)

4/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT ASO AND DEF...)

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3/30/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3/30/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/3/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEBORAH R. BRONNERIN SUPPORT OF PLATNTIFF MARCI BOSWELL,S APPLTCATTON FOR ENTRY OF , DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEBORAH R. BRONNERIN SUPPORT OF PLATNTIFF MARCI BOSWELL,S APPLTCATTON FOR ENTRY OF , DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARCI BOSWELL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF MARCI BOSWELL'S APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARCI BOSWELL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF MARCI BOSWELL'S APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Request for Dismissal

2/3/2021: Request for Dismissal

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Marci Boswell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Marci Boswell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by Marci Boswell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of Identity and Order; Filed by Marci Boswell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marci Boswell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marci Boswell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF RIGHT TO SEEK PUNITIVE DAMAGES AGAINST ASO, L.L.C., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; TD FORECLOSURE SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; LYNN WOLCOTT; AND DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE); Filed by Marci Boswell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Marci Boswell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marci Boswell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marci Boswell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD FORECLOSURE SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ASO L.L.C. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRONNER DEBORAH R. ESQ.