This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2023 at 05:45:49 (UTC).

MARCHON EYEWEAR, INC VS LUCIA ARAKELYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 MARCHON EYEWEAR, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LUCIA ARAKELYAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1674

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCHON EYEWEAR INC

Defendants

AMAYAKYAN VARTAN

ARAKELYAN LUCIA AKA LUSINE ARAKELYAN AKA LYUSYA ARAKELYAN DBA RAGE EYEWEAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINASSIAN NATALIA

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/25/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/25/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/25/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/25/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/25/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/25/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/27/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/30/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2023
  • Hearing05/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Marchon Eyewear, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Lucia Arakelyan (Defendant); Vartan Amayakyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Armen Tamzarian in Department 52 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Marchon Eyewear, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Lucia Arakelyan (Defendant); Vartan Amayakyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Marchon Eyewear, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Lucia Arakelyan (Defendant); Vartan Amayakyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less