This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 08:45:47 (UTC).

MARCELLUS BANKS VS ABM INDUSTRIES INCORPORATED, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 MARCELLUS BANKS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ABM INDUSTRIES INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1150

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANKS MARCELLUS

Defendants

ABM AVIATION INC.

ABM INDUSTRIES INCORPORATED

PEREZ RENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOLMQUIST MARC A.

JAVANMARDI PEDRAM AMIR

Defendant Attorney

TEINERT PAUL M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/23/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/20/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

12/17/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

12/17/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ABM INDUSTRIES INCORPORATED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ABM AVIATION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ABM INDUSTRIES INCORPORATED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MARCELLUS BANKS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARCELLUS BANKS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARCELLUS BANKS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARCELLUS BANKS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABM INDUSTRIES INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where ABM AVIATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLMQUIST MARC A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAVANMARDI PETER A.