This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/05/2022 at 06:00:19 (UTC).

MARCELINO FORD-LIVENE, AN INDIVIDUAL VS SHENG DONG LIANG, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 MARCELINO FORD-LIVENE, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHENG DONG LIANG, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8210

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD-LIVENE AN INDIVIDUAL MARCELINO

Defendant

LIANG AN INDIVIDUAL SHENG DONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHERKEZIAN EDWARD A.

ZUCKERMAN PAUL S.

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS BRYAN M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/16/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

1/20/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Proof of Personal Service

3/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/26/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/26/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

8/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Notice of Change of Firm Name

11/12/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2023
  • Hearing12/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • Hearing06/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • Hearing06/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by MARCELINO FORD-LIVENE, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Change of Handling Attorney); Filed by MARCELINO FORD-LIVENE, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SHENG DONG LIANG, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by SHENG DONG LIANG, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MARCELINO FORD-LIVENE, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARCELINO FORD-LIVENE, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARCELINO FORD-LIVENE, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARCELINO FORD-LIVENE, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHERKEZIAN EDWARD A. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZUCKERMAN PAUL S.