This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2023 at 08:53:58 (UTC).

MARCELINO ARCOS VS ABBY WOOD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 MARCELINO ARCOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ABBY WOOD,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LISA K SEPE-WIESENFELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2350

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LISA K SEPE-WIESENFELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARCOS MARCELINO

Defendants

CHIU ROMAN

WOOD ABBY

WOOD OF CHIU LIVING TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

KATIRAIE CHANEL

MILLER DANIEL B.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

5/19/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/19/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

3/29/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (FILED ON 01/24/2...)

3/29/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (FILED ON 01/24/2...)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

3/29/2023: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (FILED ON 01/24/2...) OF 03/29/2023

3/29/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (FILED ON 01/24/2...) OF 03/29/2023

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3/2/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO...) OF 02/06/2023

2/6/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO...) OF 02/06/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO...)

2/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO...)

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

1/24/2023: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

1/24/2023: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

1/24/2023: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/3/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

12/27/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

12/27/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/30/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • Hearing08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • Hearing08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • Hearing08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • Hearing08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • Hearing08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • Hearing08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Order to Show Cause Re: $250 in Sanctions Against Plaintiff for Failure to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • Hearing08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: $250 in Sanctions Against Plaintiff for Failure to Appear scheduled for 08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: MARCELINO ARCOS (Plaintiff); As to: WOOD OF CHIU LIVING TRUST (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/29/2022; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Case Management Conference: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Case Management Conference: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Craig D. Karlan in Department N Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MARCELINO ARCOS (Plaintiff); As to: ABBY WOOD (Defendant); ROMAN CHIU (Defendant); WOOD OF CHIU LIVING TRUST (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARCELINO ARCOS (Plaintiff); As to: ABBY WOOD (Defendant); ROMAN CHIU (Defendant); WOOD OF CHIU LIVING TRUST (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MARCELINO ARCOS (Plaintiff); As to: ABBY WOOD (Defendant); ROMAN CHIU (Defendant); WOOD OF CHIU LIVING TRUST (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less