This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2022 at 15:33:31 (UTC).

MARCELA PINEDA SANCHEZ VS FRANK LOBOS

Case Summary

On 12/09/2022 MARCELA PINEDA SANCHEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FRANK LOBOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8429

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ MARCELA PINEDA

Defendant

LOBOS FRANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMASSIAN VACHE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/9/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

12/9/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

12/9/2022: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/9/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/9/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2024
  • Hearing12/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2024
  • Hearing06/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2024
  • Hearing05/24/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MARCELA PINEDA SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FRANK LOBOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARCELA PINEDA SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FRANK LOBOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MARCELA PINEDA SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FRANK LOBOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/24/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less