This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 13:52:55 (UTC).

MARC RABINS VS FRANKLIN HOLDINGS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 MARC RABINS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FRANKLIN HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5134

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

RABINS MARC

CAMPOS RAMIREZ

PETATAN ISABEL LOPEZ

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FRANKLIN HOLDINGS LLC

HANSON JIM

HANSON TOM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

LEONARD WILLIAM SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

SHAFRON MARK HENRY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

10/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/28/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

6/14/2021: Request for Dismissal

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

6/14/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/9/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

7/9/2021: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

7/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/4/2021: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/20/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/24/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

3/2/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

3/4/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

3/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2024
  • Hearing02/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Hearing08/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • Hearing07/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Franklin Holdings, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Franklin Holdings, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Franklin Holdings, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Franklin Holdings, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Marc Rabins (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Franklin Holdings, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Marc Rabins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marc Rabins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marc Rabins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Marc Rabins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marc Rabins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Marc Rabins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marc Rabins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRANKLIN HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEONARD WILLIAM SCOTT