This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 03:53:55 (UTC).

MARC MCDERMOTT, ET AL. VS STEPHANIE SPENCER

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 MARC MCDERMOTT filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEPHANIE SPENCER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7257

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GILSON JULIE

MCDERMOTT CATHERINE

MCDERMOTT MARC

Defendant

SPENCER STEPHANIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOVAK SEAN M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

8/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

8/5/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/23/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2024
  • Hearing07/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • Hearing01/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Hearing01/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marc McDermott (Plaintiff); Catherine McDermott (Plaintiff); Julie Gilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marc McDermott (Plaintiff); Catherine McDermott (Plaintiff); Julie Gilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Marc McDermott (Plaintiff); Catherine McDermott (Plaintiff); Julie Gilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOVAK SEAN M