This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2021 at 17:37:38 (UTC).

MARC J. GEDEON, A PROF. LAW CORP. VS GUVEN UZUN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/24/2020 MARC J GEDEON, A PROF LAW CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GUVEN UZUN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5820

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARC J. GEDEON A PROF. LAW CORP.

Defendants

PLAYA ADVANCE URGENT CARE INC.

UZUN GUVEN

SILICON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER INC.

HARPER GLADYS ANNE

PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE LLC

ORION WEST GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HASIC HALIL

Defendant Attorney

HUNT STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

12/3/2020: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

11/2/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/16/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

11/16/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/16/2020

11/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/16/2020

Case Management Statement

9/16/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

9/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/27/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/27/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/27/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/6/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/6/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/6/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • Hearing04/18/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • Hearing04/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Guven Uzun (Defendant); Gladys Anne Harper (Defendant); Playa Advance Urgent Care, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Guven Uzun (Defendant); Gladys Anne Harper (Defendant); Playa Advance Urgent Care, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Marc J. Gedeon, A Prof. Law Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Marc J. Gedeon, A Prof. Law Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Marc J. Gedeon, A Prof. Law Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Marc J. Gedeon, A Prof. Law Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marc J. Gedeon, A Prof. Law Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marc J. Gedeon, A Prof. Law Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Marc J. Gedeon, A Prof. Law Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marc J. Gedeon, A Prof. Law Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLAYA ADVANCE URGENT CARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ORION WEST GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SILICON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER INC. is a litigant