This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 18:40:32 (UTC).

MARC GOLD VS TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 MARC GOLD filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0905

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLD MARC

Defendants

TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA INC.

TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING

TUSTIN TOYOTA

TOYOTA OF HUNTINGTON BEACH A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING A CORPORATION

OREMOR OF TUSTIN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

D W W III CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TUSTIN TOYOTA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA INC. A CORPORATION

TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA INC. A KENTUCKY CORPORATION

TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING INDIANA INC.

TOYOTA MOTOR SALES USA INC.

TOYOTA ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA INC.

TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING CALIFORNIA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORDIN-WOSK JOSHUA

Defendant Attorneys

HOOPER BOBBIE EFTEKAR

HOSTETLER HARRY FRANKLIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

9/10/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

8/11/2021: Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/16/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

8/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT OREMOR OF TUSTIN, INC. DBS TUSTIN TOYOTA'S REPLY MEMORANDUM TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/18/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT OREMOR OF TUSTIN, INC. DBS TUSTIN TOYOTA'S REPLY MEMORANDUM TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/28/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

6/28/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/28/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/29/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

6/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/29/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Ruling

6/30/2021: Notice of Ruling

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

5/24/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/2/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

2/9/2021: PI General Order

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/9/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Personal Service

1/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2024
  • Hearing01/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • Hearing07/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • Hearing06/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Hearing10/29/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continued Hearing on the Toyota Defendants' Demurrer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint); Filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Toyota Motor Manufacturing, a corporation (Defendant); Tustin Toyota, a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Tustin Toyota, a California corporation (Defendant); Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketOpposition (REVISED - TO DEMURRER TO SAC); Filed by Marc Gold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketOpposition (to Demurrer to SAC); Filed by Marc Gold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike (TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT;); Filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Tustin Toyota, a California corporation (Defendant); Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Marc Gold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Marc Gold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Marc Gold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Marc Gold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marc Gold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marc Gold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marc Gold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marc Gold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marc Gold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Marc Gold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tustin Toyota is a litigant

Latest cases where OREMOR OF TUSTIN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where D W W III CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING INDIANA INC. is a litigant