This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2022 at 12:47:29 (UTC).

MARC ANTHONY OLAGUE VS CITY OF ALHAMBRA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 MARC ANTHONY OLAGUE filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF ALHAMBRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1502

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLAGUE MARC ANTHONY

Claimant

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ALHAMBRA VALLEY PROPERTIES LLC

CHASE CENTERS MANAGEMENT INC.

CITY OF ALHAMBRA

ROES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

MOES 1 TO 50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOMINGO MICHAEL

Claimant Attorney

FITZPATRICK PETER VINCENT

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MULVIHILL CYNTHIA COULTER

NEBENZAHL MICHAEL RALPH

 

Court Documents

Answer

5/6/2022: Answer

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

3/7/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Notice of Lien

3/10/2022: Notice of Lien

Request for Dismissal

3/24/2022: Request for Dismissal

Cross-Complaint

4/4/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/4/2022: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

4/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/25/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Personal Service

2/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

2/16/2022: Cross-Complaint

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

2/16/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Answer

2/16/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/16/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/13/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2025
  • Hearing01/09/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • Hearing07/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • Hearing06/29/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Chase Centers Management, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Alhambra Valley Properties, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by City of Alhambra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint); Filed by City of Alhambra (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by City of Alhambra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Alhambra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Marc Anthony Olague (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marc Anthony Olague (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marc Anthony Olague (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Marc Anthony Olague (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALHAMBRA VALLEY PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF ALHAMBRA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK PETER V.