This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2022 at 09:15:32 (UTC).

MARAL KEEGHAM, AN INDIVIDUAL VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC., A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 MARAL KEEGHAM, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC , A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0439

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEEGHAM AN INDIVIDUAL MARAL

Defendant

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZOLONZ ADAM MARTIN

Defendant Attorney

SADDIGH IVANA BOLCHEVA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/22/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/21/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/21/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

7/21/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

9/6/2022: Answer

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/26/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

8/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • Hearing12/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • Hearing11/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BMW of North America, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maral Keegham, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maral Keegham, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maral Keegham, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maral Keegham, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZOLONZ ADAM M.