This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/27/2021 at 00:49:50 (UTC).

MARAL KALAJIAN VS SMART & FINAL STORES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 MARAL KALAJIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SMART FINAL STORES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY E. KENDIG, JON R. TAKASUGI and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9657

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY E. KENDIG

JON R. TAKASUGI

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KALAJIAN MARAL

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

SMART & FINAL STORES INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

MOREHART LAND CO.

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

DRUCKER BARRY A. ESQ.

GOURJIAN NAREG

DRUCKER BARRY ALAN ESQ.

BORSUTZKI CLAUDIA

CLANCEY CLIFFORD ALLEN

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GOURJIAN NAREG

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BORSUTZKI CLAUDIA

CLANCEY CLIFFORD ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/4/2021: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 08/27/2020

8/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 08/27/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY OR...)

4/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY OR...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 05/04/2020

5/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 05/04/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

3/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/17/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY TO CONTINUE TRIAL TO ACCOMMODATE THEIR SCH

11/19/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY TO CONTINUE TRIAL TO ACCOMMODATE THEIR SCH

Declaration - DECLARATION OF HOWARD L. LAGUNA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/22/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF HOWARD L. LAGUNA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Motion for Summary Judgment

11/22/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

11/26/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Separate Statement

1/24/2020: Separate Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOREHART LAND CO. AND SMART & FINAL STORES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIRES

1/24/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOREHART LAND CO. AND SMART & FINAL STORES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIRES

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. GOLDE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOREHART LAND CO. AND SMART & FINAL STORES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/24/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. GOLDE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOREHART LAND CO. AND SMART & FINAL STORES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

2/5/2020: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Notice of Ruling

2/10/2020: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Personal Service

10/18/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint -

10/5/2018: Cross-Complaint -

Answer -

10/5/2018: Answer -

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 03/25/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal ((not entered)); Filed by Maral Kalajian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference (Motion for Summary Judgment) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docketat 3:45 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Maral Kalajian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 08/27/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by smart & Final Stores, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by smart & Final Stores, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Maral Kalajian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maral Kalajian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC719657    Hearing Date: February 07, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MARAL KALAJIAN,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

SMART & FINAL STORES, INC., ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC719657

[TENTATIVE] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

February 7, 2020

The Court is in receipt of (a) Defendant’s moving papers, filed on 11/22/19, and (b) Plaintiff’s opposition papers, filed on 1/24/20.  Any reply to the opposition was due on or before 1/31/20.  The Court has not, to date, received any reply papers.  The Court is concerned that Defendant may have filed reply papers, but that the papers have not made it into the Court’s online system.  The Court wishes to review any timely filed reply documents prior to rendering a ruling on the motion. 

Additionally, the Court’s First Amended General Order Re: Mandatory Electronic Filing for Civil, dated 5/03/19, ¶9(b)(vi, requires parties to lodge tabbed courtesy copies of all papers in support of or in opposition to a summary judgment motion.  The Court has not received courtesy copies of the moving or opposition papers.  The Court also did not receive a courtesy copy of any reply documents that may have been filed. 

The Court notes that trial is not scheduled until 5/27/20, and therefore there is no urgency to hearing this motion.  The Court continues the motion for one month, to Friday, 3/06/20 at 1:30 p.m. in Department 31 of the Spring Street Courthouse.  The parties must lodge courtesy copies of the moving, opposition, and reply papers directly in the department at least two weeks prior to the continued hearing date.

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. 
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOREHART LAND CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where SMART & FINAL STORES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOURJIAN NAREG